Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Maria (Jean Luc) Volanti, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1683Born
3 Apr 170622.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
19 Apr 174157.9SelectedBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia
3 Jul 174158.1ConfirmedBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia
9 Jul 174158.2Ordained BishopBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia
25 Jun 174461.1DiedBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Angelo Maria (Jean Luc) Volanti
Bishop Angelo Maria (Jean Luc) Volanti O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Stagno (Ston)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRagusa

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 386
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast