Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Fabbretti

Deceased

Bishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1687³BornUrbini
17 Nov 171528.3Ordained PriestPriest
19 Nov 173649.3AppointedBishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy
25 Nov 173649.3Ordained BishopBishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy
18 Nov 174760.3DiedBishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Fabbretti:
Bishop Giuseppe Fabbretti (born , died ) Bishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado

  • a priest for 32.0 years
  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 7 Oct 2013