Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Luigi de Andujar, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tortona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1693BornForte di Fuentes
21 Dec 171522.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
6 May 173744.3AppointedBishop of Bobbio, Italy
19 May 173744.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bobbio, Italy
11 Mar 174350.1AppointedBishop of Tortona, Italy
2 Feb 178289.0DiedBishop of Tortona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Luigi de Andujar:
Bishop Giuseppe Luigi de Andujar O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Tortona

  • a priest for 66.1 years
  • a bishop for 44.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 125, and Page 194
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1737, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015