Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Facoia, C.P.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Castellammare di Stabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1663BornNapoli
28 Sep 168724.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Pious Workers
16 Aug 173067.4SelectedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
2 Oct 173067.6ConfirmedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
8 Oct 173067.6Ordained BishopBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
20 Apr 174380.1DiedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Facoia:
Bishop Tommaso Facoia C.P.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Castellammare di Stabia

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 154

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013