Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Redetti

Deceased

Bishop of Bergamo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1696BornRovigo
28 Aug 172932.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 173034.0AppointedBishop of Bergamo, Italy
30 Nov 173034.1Ordained BishopBishop of Bergamo, Italy
2 May 177376.5DiedBishop of Bergamo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Redetti:
Bishop Antonio Redetti (born , died ) Bishop of Bergamo

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 42.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013