Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel António Pires

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kwito-Bié


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1915BornVinhais, Portugal
8 Apr 193924.0Ordained PriestPriest
7 Mar 195539.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Silva Porto, Angola
7 Mar 195539.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Alia
29 Jun 195540.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alia
23 Sep 195843.5SucceededBishop of Silva Porto, Angola
15 Jun 197964.2ResignedBishop of Kwito-Bié, Angola
2 Apr 199984.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Kwito-Bié, Angola

MicroData Summary for Manuel António Pires:
Bishop Manuel António Pires (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kwito-Bié

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 43.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 50
  • bp: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1999, Page 366

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013