Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gualtiero Sigismondi

Bishop of Orvieto-Todi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1961 Born
29 Jun 198625.3Ordained PriestPriest of Perugia, Italy
3 Jul 200847.3AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
12 Sep 200847.5Ordained BishopBishop of Foligno, Italy
5 Oct 200847.6InstalledBishop of Foligno, Italy
7 Mar 202059.0AppointedBishop of Orvieto-Todi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gualtiero Sigismondi (VIAF: 232188882)
Bishop Gualtiero Sigismondi (born ) Bishop of Orvieto-Todi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOspedalicchio di Bastia Umbra
Ordained BishopSan Lorenzo, Cathedral, Perugia, Archdiocese of Perugia-Città della Pieve

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Orvieto-Todi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,958
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast