Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthew Shija

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kahama, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1924Born
17 Jan 195429.7Ordained PriestPriest
11 Nov 198359.5AppointedBishop of Kahama, Tanzania
26 Feb 198459.8Ordained BishopBishop of Kahama, Tanzania
24 Apr 200177.0RetiredBishop of Kahama, Tanzania
9 Dec 201591.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Kahama, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Matthew Shija
Bishop Matthew Shija (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kahama

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuge

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 10 Dec 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast