Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Timothy Kieran Cotter, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Maiduguri, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1916Born
13 Jul 194125.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
5 Jul 196246.0AppointedPrefect of Maiduguri, Nigeria
7 Jun 196649.9AppointedBishop of Maiduguri, Nigeria
8 Sep 196650.2Ordained BishopBishop of Maiduguri, Nigeria
15 Mar 198871.7DiedBishop of Maiduguri, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for James Timothy Kieran Cotter
Bishop James Timothy Kieran Cotter O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Maiduguri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAbbeyfeale co. Limerick, Ireland

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast