Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Senan Louis O’Donnell, O.S.A.

Bishop Emeritus of Maiduguri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1927 BornScattery Island, Ireland
17 Jul 195528.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
18 Sep 199366.6AppointedBishop of Maiduguri, Nigeria
28 Nov 199366.8Ordained BishopBishop of Maiduguri, Nigeria
28 Feb 200376.0RetiredBishop of Maiduguri, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Senan Louis O’Donnell:
Bishop Senan Louis O’Donnell O.S.A. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Maiduguri

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Maiduguri.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,180

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013