Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Matthew Man-oso Ndagoso

Archbishop of Kaduna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1960 BornLot
4 Oct 198626.7Ordained PriestPriest of Yola, Nigeria
6 Feb 200343.0AppointedBishop of Maiduguri, Nigeria
1 May 200343.3Ordained BishopBishop of Maiduguri, Nigeria
16 Nov 200747.8AppointedArchbishop of Kaduna, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Matthew Man-oso Ndagoso:
Archbishop Matthew Man-oso Ndagoso (born ) Archbishop of Kaduna

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kaduna.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Nov 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,397

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 2 Feb 2015