Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Raymond Shea

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Evansville, Indiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1913Born
19 Mar 193925.2Ordained PriestPriest of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
1 Dec 196955.9AppointedBishop of Evansville, Indiana, USA
3 Feb 197056.1Ordained BishopBishop of Evansville, Indiana, USA
11 Mar 198975.2RetiredBishop of Evansville, Indiana, USA
18 Aug 199480.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Evansville, Indiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Raymond Shea
Bishop Francis Raymond Shea (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Evansville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKnoxville, TN
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Benedict, Church, Evansville, Diocese of Evansville, Indiana

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 9 Feb 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 359

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast