Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Daniel Niedergeses

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nashville, Tennessee, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1917Born
20 May 194427.2Ordained PriestPriest of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
8 Apr 197558.1AppointedBishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
20 May 197558.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
13 Oct 199275.6RetiredBishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
16 Nov 200790.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Nashville, Tennessee, USA

MicroData Summary for James Daniel Niedergeses
Bishop James Daniel Niedergeses (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nashville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLawrenceburg

  • a priest for 63.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,445
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 4 Jun 2017