Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mikail Nersès Sétian

Deceased

Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of United States of America and Canada (Armenian), New York

Titular Bishop of Ancyra degli Armeni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1918BornSivas, Turkey
13 Apr 194122.4Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 198162.6AppointedApostolic Exarch of United States of America and Canada (Armenian), New York
3 Jul 198162.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Ancyra degli Armeni
5 Dec 198163.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ancyra degli Armeni
18 Sep 199374.8RetiredApostolic Exarch of United States of America and Canada (Armenian), New York
9 Sep 200283.8DiedApostolic Exarch Emeritus of United States of America and Canada (Armenian), New York

MicroData Summary for Mikail Nersès Sétian:
Bishop Mikail Nersès Sétian (born , died ) Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of United States of America and Canada

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013