Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Coussa

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Baghdad (Armenian), Iraq


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1917Born
17 Apr 194123.6Ordained PriestPriest
26 Aug 196951.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
26 Aug 196951.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Colonia in Armenia
21 Dec 196952.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Colonia in Armenia
27 Jun 198365.7AppointedArchbishop of Baghdad (Armenian), Iraq
13 Oct 200184.0RetiredArchbishop of Baghdad (Armenian), Iraq
7 Jul 201294.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Baghdad (Armenian), Iraq

MicroData Summary for Paul Coussa
Archbishop Paul Coussa (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Baghdad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlep

  • a priest for 71.2 years
  • a bishop for 42.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 9 Jul 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast