Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vartán Waldir Boghossian, S.D.B.

Bishop Emeritus of San Gregorio de Narek en Buenos Aires (Armenian), Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1940 Born
22 Dec 196626.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
3 Jul 198141.3AppointedApostolic Exarch of America Latina e Messico {Latin America and Mexico} (Armenian)
3 Jul 198141.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Mardin degli Armeni
12 Dec 198141.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mardin degli Armeni
18 Feb 198948.9AppointedBishop of San Gregorio de Narek en Buenos Aires (Armenian), Argentina
4 Jul 201878.3RetiredApostolic Exarch of America Latina e Messico {Latin America and Mexico} (Armenian)
4 Jul 201878.3RetiredBishop of San Gregorio de Narek en Buenos Aires (Armenian), Argentina

MicroData Summary for Vartán Waldir Boghossian
Bishop Vartán Waldir Boghossian S.D.B. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of San Gregorio de Narek en Buenos Aires

EventPlace
Birth PlacePenápolis

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of San Gregorio de Narek en Buenos Aires (Armenian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 4 Jul 2018

Quantcast