Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antoine Marullo

Deceased

Archbishop of Manfredonia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Aug 1643AppointedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
20 Sep 1643Ordained BishopArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
18 Dec 1648DiedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antoine Marullo
Archbishop Antoine Marullo (died ) Archbishop of Manfredonia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo

  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 316
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1643, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018