Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Antonio Díaz de Cabrera

Deceased

Bishop of Salamanca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1614¹BornMadrid
5 Apr 166046.3AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
18 Apr 166046.3Ordained BishopBishop of Salamanca, Spain
22 Aug 166147.6DiedBishop of Salamanca, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Antonio Díaz de Cabrera:
Bishop Francisco Antonio Díaz de Cabrera (died ) Bishop of Salamanca

  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 301
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 191, Number 1,201

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013