Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambrose Papaiah Yeddanapalli, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bellary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1914BornPannur
3 Oct 194329.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
10 Dec 196349.3AppointedBishop of Bellary, India
14 Apr 196449.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bellary, India
6 Oct 199278.1RetiredBishop of Bellary, India
20 Nov 199783.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Bellary, India

MicroData Summary for Ambrose Papaiah Yeddanapalli:
Bishop Ambrose Papaiah Yeddanapalli O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bellary

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013