Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juarez Sousa Da Silva

Bishop of Parnaíba, Piaui


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1961 BornBarras (Cabeceiras do Piaui)
19 Mar 199432.7Ordained PriestPriest of Campo Maior, Piaui, Brazil
27 Feb 200846.6AppointedBishop of Oeiras, Piaui, Brazil
17 May 200846.8Ordained BishopBishop of Oeiras, Piaui, Brazil
25 Sep 201554.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of São Raimundo Nonato, Piaui, Brazil
6 Jan 201654.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Parnaíba, Piaui, Brazil
2 Apr 201654.7CeasedApostolic Administrator of São Raimundo Nonato, Piaui, Brazil
24 Aug 201655.1SucceededBishop of Parnaíba, Piaui, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Juarez Sousa Da Silva
Bishop Juarez Sousa Da Silva (born ) Bishop of Parnaíba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Parnaíba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Feb 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,745
  • ab: CB, 28 Sep 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Jan 2016
  • s: Bollettino, 24 Aug 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 Aug 2016