Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Baptist Gegg

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Worms

Titular Bishop of Trapezopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1664³BornEichstätt
3 Apr 168823.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Eichstätt, Germany
12 Jun 168824.0Ordained PriestPriest of Eichstätt, Germany
30 Mar 171651.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Worms, Germany
30 Mar 171651.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Trapezopolis
26 Jul 171652.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Trapezopolis
9 Sep 173066.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Worms, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Baptist Gegg:
Bishop Johann Baptist Gegg (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Worms

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 386
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1716, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 4 Aug 2015