Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Edmund Gedult von Jungenfeld

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

Titular Bishop of Mallus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1652BornMainz
9 Dec 167523.2Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
12 Feb 170350.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
12 Feb 170350.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Mallus
8 Jul 170350.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mallus
31 Jul 172774.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Edmund Gedult von Jungenfeld:
Bishop Johann Edmund Gedult von Jungenfeld (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,576
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 14
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 253

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 6 Jul 2015