Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolino Schiavon

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Trebia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1939 Born
5 Jul 196424.8Ordained PriestPriest of Padova {Padua}, Italy
18 Jul 200262.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
18 Jul 200262.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Trebia
21 Sep 200263.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Trebia
6 Mar 201575.5RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy

MicroData Summary
Paolino Schiavon
Bishop Paolino Schiavon
(born )
Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTerranegra di Padova, Diocese of Padova {Padua}
Ordained BishopSan Giovanni in Laterano, Cathedral Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Roma {Rome}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,253
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Mar 2015
  • opd/c1: AM, 28 May 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025