Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Jeremiah McRaith

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Owensboro, Kentucky, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1934Born
21 Feb 196025.2Ordained PriestPriest of New Ulm, Minnesota, USA
23 Oct 198247.8AppointedBishop of Owensboro, Kentucky, USA
15 Dec 198248.0Ordained BishopBishop of Owensboro, Kentucky, USA
5 Jan 200974.0ResignedBishop of Owensboro, Kentucky, USA
19 Mar 201782.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Owensboro, Kentucky, USA

MicroData Summary for John Jeremiah McRaith
Bishop John Jeremiah McRaith (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Owensboro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHutchinson, Diocese of New Ulm, Minnesota
Death PlaceOwensboro, Diocese of Owensboro, Kentucky

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Jan 2009
  • d: CB, 19 Mar 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast