Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Hernán Sánchez Porras

Deceased

Bishop of Venezuela, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1944BornPalmira
25 Jun 196723.2Ordained PriestPriest of San Cristóbal de Venezuela
19 Dec 200056.7AppointedBishop of Venezuela, Military
16 Feb 200156.8Ordained BishopBishop of Venezuela, Military
13 Oct 201470.5DiedBishop of Venezuela, Military

MicroData Summary for José Hernán Sánchez Porras:
Bishop José Hernán Sánchez Porras (born , died ) Bishop of Venezuela, Military

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,907
  • d: CB, 13 Oct 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015