Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Territorial Prelature of Tefé

Praelatura Territorialis Tefensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Territorial Prelature
  • Erected: 11 August 1950
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Manaus
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Amazonas
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 263,835 (101,906 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Norte I
  • Mailing Address: C.P. 21, Rua Duque de Coxias 438, 69470-000 Tefe, AM, Brazil
  • Telephone: (092) 743-2563
  • Fax: 743-2663

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Tefé
23 May 1910ErectedDiocese of Amazonas Prefecture Apostolic of Tefé (erected)
22 May 1931Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Tefé Territorial Prelature of Juruá (erected)
Territorial Prelature of Tefé
11 August 1950ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Tefé Territorial Prelature of Tefé (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Tefé
195046,89749,95393.9%23232,03923106ap1951
196574,81177,11197.0%12126,23420107ap1967
197081,65083,65097.6%14145,83222108ap1971
197683,00085,00097.6%12126,91616179ap1977
198077,40080,50096.1%13135,95318249ap1981
199099,600120,00083.0%16166,225181810ap1991
1999122,000187,80065.0%101012,200111910ap2000
2000122,000187,00065.2%111111,090131910ap2001
2001120,927181,92766.5%291110,993111910ap2002
2002120,927181,92766.5%2101210,077111910ap2003
2003161,640215,52175.0%2111312,433132110ap2004
2004161,640215,52175.0%4101411,545122111ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 5 Jun 2014