Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Magnus Mwalunyungu

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tunduru-Masasi, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1930Born
23 Aug 195928.9Ordained PriestPriest
30 Mar 199261.5AppointedBishop of Tunduru-Masasi, Tanzania
25 Jun 199261.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tunduru-Masasi, Tanzania
25 Aug 200575.0RetiredBishop of Tunduru-Masasi, Tanzania
13 Feb 201584.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Tunduru-Masasi, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Magnus Mwalunyungu
Bishop Magnus Mwalunyungu (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tunduru-Masasi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNsengilindete

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Aug 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,781
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 14 Feb 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast