Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond Mwanyika

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Njombe, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1930Born
11 Oct 195929.7Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jan 197141.0AppointedBishop of Njombe, Tanzania
25 Apr 197141.3Ordained BishopBishop of Njombe, Tanzania
8 Jun 200272.4ResignedBishop of Njombe, Tanzania
24 Oct 201383.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Njombe, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Raymond Mwanyika
Bishop Raymond Mwanyika (born 1930, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Njombe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUwemba

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 42.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 24 Oct 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast