Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ítalo Severino Di Stéfano

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of San Juan de Cuyo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1923BornLlambi Campbell
21 Sep 194623.6Ordained PriestPriest
12 Aug 196340.5AppointedBishop of Presidencia Roque Sáenz Peña, Argentina
19 Apr 196441.2Ordained BishopBishop of Presidencia Roque Sáenz Peña, Argentina
8 Nov 198057.8AppointedArchbishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
22 Mar 198158.1InstalledArchbishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
29 Mar 200077.1RetiredArchbishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
11 Oct 200279.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Ítalo Severino Di Stéfano:
Archbishop Ítalo Severino Di Stéfano (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of San Juan de Cuyo

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 22 Feb 2015