Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raúl Marcelo Pacífico Scozzina, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Formosa, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1921Born
23 Dec 194423.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
7 May 195735.7AppointedBishop of Formosa, Argentina
21 Jul 195735.9Ordained BishopBishop of Formosa, Argentina
28 Sep 195736.1InstalledBishop of Formosa, Argentina
31 Mar 197856.6ResignedBishop of Formosa, Argentina
11 Jun 201189.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Formosa, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Raúl Marcelo Pacífico Scozzina
Bishop Raúl Marcelo Pacífico Scozzina O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Formosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Martín Norte

  • a priest for 66.4 years
  • a bishop for 53.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 11 Jun 2011
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018