Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominik Premuš

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Zagreb

Titular Bishop of Belgrado e Semendria o Smederevo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1861BornPrelog
25 Jul 188524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Zagreb, Croatia
26 Feb 191553.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia
26 Feb 191553.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Belgrado e Semendria o Smederevo
18 Apr 191553.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Belgrado e Semendria o Smederevo
27 Mar 193472.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Dominik Premuš:
Bishop Dominik Premuš (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Zagreb

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1935
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1915, Number 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 May 2014