Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Atsumi Misue

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hiroshima, Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1936Born
19 Mar 196225.9Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 198548.9AppointedBishop of Hiroshima, Japan
16 Jun 198549.1Ordained BishopBishop of Hiroshima, Japan
13 Jun 201175.1RetiredBishop of Hiroshima, Japan
28 Jun 201680.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Hiroshima, Japan

MicroData Summary for Joseph Atsumi Misue
Bishop Joseph Atsumi Misue (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hiroshima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHoki

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Jun 2011
  • d: CB, 28 Jun 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 Jun 2018

Quantcast