Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Baltazar de Faria Villas-Boas

Deceased

Bishop of Elvas, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1688³Born
24 Sep 171829.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Sep 171829.9Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 174354.7SelectedBishop of Elvas, Portugal
29 Jul 174354.8ConfirmedBishop of Elvas, Portugal
27 Oct 174355.0Ordained BishopBishop of Elvas, Portugal
30 Jul 175768.8DiedBishop of Elvas, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Baltazar de Faria Villas-Boas
Bishop Baltazar de Faria Villas-Boas (born , died ) Bishop of Elvas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarcellos

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 207
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,743, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast