Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Ferdinand von Rummel

Deceased

Bishop of Wien


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1644BornWeiden
Jan 167530.1Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
10 Oct 169550.9SelectedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
2 Apr 169651.4ConfirmedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
29 Jul 169651.7Ordained BishopBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
11 Jul 170661.7SelectedBishop of Wien, Austria
4 Oct 170661.9ConfirmedBishop of Wien, Austria
12 Dec 170662.1InstalledBishop of Wien, Austria
15 Mar 171671.3DiedBishop of Wien, Austria

MicroData Summary for Franz Ferdinand von Rummel:
Bishop Franz Ferdinand von Rummel (born , died ) Bishop of Wien

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 381, and Page 414
  • ob/c2+: CB, 22 Sep 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1696, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015