Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Otto de la Bourde

Deceased

Bishop of Gurk


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1630¹BornCheb, Czech Republic
12 Jan 169767.0SelectedBishop of Gurk, Austria
27 Apr 169767.3ConfirmedBishop of Gurk, Austria
28 Apr 169767.3Ordained BishopBishop of Gurk, Austria
24 Dec 170878.9DiedBishop of Gurk, Austria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Otto de la Bourde:
Bishop Otto de la Bourde (born 1630, died ) Bishop of Gurk

  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 216
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1697, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015