Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ágoston Benkovich, O.S.P.P.E. †

Deceased

Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1632¹Born
28 Dec 168149.9SelectedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
25 May 168250.3ConfirmedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
17 Jan 168351.0Ordained BishopBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
27 Oct 170270.8DiedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ágoston Benkovich
Bishop Ágoston Benkovich O.S.P.P.E. (born 1632, died ) Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNitra

  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 405
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1682, Number 38
  • b/c2+: ATh, 25 Oct 2015
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,601

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast