Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ladislaus Matyasovski

Deceased

Bishop of Nitra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1646¹BornMatyasoviz
8 Aug 168741.6SelectedTitular Bishop of Temnus
19 Jan 169650.0SelectedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
18 Jun 169650.4ConfirmedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
10 May 170559.3DiedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Ladislaus Matyasovski:
Bishop Ladislaus Matyasovski (born 1646, died ) Bishop of Nitra

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 290
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1696, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 13 Jun 2015