Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cándido Genaro Rubiolo

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Mendoza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1920BornDevoto
22 Sep 194525.0Ordained PriestPriest
4 Sep 197454.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Córdoba, Argentina
4 Sep 197454.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae in Mauretania
17 Nov 197454.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae in Mauretania
15 Apr 197756.6AppointedBishop of Villa María, Argentina
13 Jul 197756.8InstalledBishop of Villa María, Argentina
11 Oct 197959.1AppointedArchbishop of Mendoza, Argentina
23 Nov 197959.2InstalledArchbishop of Mendoza, Argentina
25 Mar 199675.5RetiredArchbishop of Mendoza, Argentina
9 Feb 200483.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Mendoza, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Cándido Genaro Rubiolo:
Archbishop Cándido Genaro Rubiolo (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Mendoza

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013