Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Rotolo, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti

Titular Bishop of Nazianzus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1881BornScanno
10 Aug 190524.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
5 Oct 193756.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Velletri, Italy
5 Oct 193756.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Nazianzus
31 Oct 193756.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nazianzus
1 Apr 194866.7AppointedPrelate of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy
1962²80.5RetiredPrelate of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy
20 Oct 196988.3DiedPrelate Emeritus of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Rotolo:
Bishop Salvatore Rotolo S.D.B. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti

  • a priest for 64.2 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013