Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Lucato, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Isernia e Venafro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1892Born
23 Sep 192229.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
13 Sep 193946.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Derna, Libya
13 Sep 193946.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigias
5 Nov 193947.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigias
21 Jun 194855.6AppointedBishop of Isernia e Venafro, Italy
1 May 196269.5DiedBishop of Isernia e Venafro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Lucato
Bishop Giovanni Lucato S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Isernia e Venafro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCornedo

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast