Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario Rossi

Deceased

Bishop of Vigevano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1914Born
29 Jun 193823.7Ordained PriestPriest
4 Aug 197156.8AppointedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
3 Oct 197157.0Ordained BishopBishop of Vigevano, Italy
19 Aug 198873.8DiedBishop of Vigevano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mario Rossi
Bishop Mario Rossi (born , died ) Bishop of Vigevano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMassimo Visconti
Ordained BishopChurch, Tregate, Diocese of Novara

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 850

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast