Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcello Rosina

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Civita Castellana (, Orte, Gallese, Nepi e Sutri), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1913Born
12 Jul 193623.4Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jan 196349.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Adria, Italy
31 Jan 196349.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Aezani
19 Mar 196350.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aezani
Jan 196955.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
10 Aug 197461.5AppointedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
10 Apr 197663.1AppointedBishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese, Italy
11 Feb 198673.0AppointedBishop of Civita Castellana (, Orte, Gallese, Nepi e Sutri), Italy
10 Mar 198976.0RetiredBishop of Civita Castellana (, Orte, Gallese, Nepi e Sutri), Italy
5 Sep 200188.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Civita Castellana (, Orte, Gallese, Nepi e Sutri), Italy

MicroData Summary for Marcello Rosina
Bishop Marcello Rosina (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Civita Castellana (, Orte, Gallese, Nepi e Sutri)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVescovana

  • a priest for 65.1 years
  • a bishop for 38.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2002, Page 987

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast