Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Roncari, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop of Pitigliano-Sovana-Orbetello, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1949 Born
15 Jul 196616.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
20 Aug 197223.0Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
22 Mar 197525.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
1 Oct 201566.1AppointedBishop of Pitigliano-Sovana-Orbetello, Italy
21 Nov 201566.2Ordained BishopBishop of Pitigliano-Sovana-Orbetello, Italy
29 Nov 201566.2InstalledBishop of Pitigliano-Sovana-Orbetello, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Roncari
Bishop Giovanni Roncari O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop of Pitigliano-Sovana-Orbetello

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVerona, Diocese of Verona

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pitigliano-Sovana-Orbetello.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Oct 2015
  • ob/c2+/i: CB, 8 Oct 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,673

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast