Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés Napoleón Romero Cárdenas

Bishop of Barahona, Dominican Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1967 Born
8 Jul 199527.9Ordained PriestPriest of San Francisco de Macorís, Dominican Republic
23 Feb 201547.5AppointedBishop of Barahona, Dominican Republic
25 Apr 201547.7Ordained BishopBishop of Barahona, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Andrés Napoleón Romero Cárdenas
Bishop Andrés Napoleón Romero Cárdenas (born ) Bishop of Barahona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRamonal Arriba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Barahona.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Feb 2015
  • bd: CB, 23 Feb 2015
  • ob: CB, 27 Feb 2015
  • c2+: CB, 25 Apr 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,484

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 20 Sep 2017