Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Denis George Browne

Bishop Emeritus of Hamilton in New Zealand


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1937 BornAuckland
30 Jun 196224.8Ordained PriestPriest of Auckland, New Zealand
21 Mar 197739.5AppointedBishop of Rarotonga, Cook Islands, Pacific (Oceania)
29 Jun 197739.8Ordained BishopBishop of Rarotonga, Cook Islands, Pacific (Oceania)
6 Jun 198345.7AppointedBishop of Auckland, New Zealand
19 Dec 199457.2AppointedBishop of Hamilton in New Zealand
22 Nov 201477.2RetiredBishop of Hamilton in New Zealand

MicroData Summary for Denis George Browne:
Bishop Denis George Browne (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Hamilton in New Zealand

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hamilton in New Zealand.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Nov 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 22 Nov 2014