Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick James Dunn

Bishop of Auckland, New Zealand


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1950 Born
24 Apr 197626.2Ordained PriestPriest of Auckland, New Zealand
10 Jun 199444.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Auckland, New Zealand
10 Jun 199444.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Fesseë
25 Jul 199444.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fesseë
19 Dec 199444.8AppointedBishop of Auckland, New Zealand
29 Mar 199545.1InstalledBishop of Auckland, New Zealand

MicroData Summary for Patrick James Dunn (VIAF: 9003712)
Bishop Patrick James Dunn (born ) Bishop of Auckland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMuswell Hill, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England, Great Britain
Ordained PriestSt. Michael, Church, Remuera, Auckland, Diocese of Auckland
Ordained BishopSts. Patrick and Joseph, Cathedral, Auckland, Diocese of Auckland

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Auckland.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Number 12,354
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast