Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Michael Joyce

Deceased

Bishop of Christchurch


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1904BornLyttelton
31 Oct 193026.3Ordained PriestPriest of Christchurch, New Zealand
18 Apr 195045.8AppointedBishop of Christchurch, New Zealand
16 Jul 195046.1Ordained BishopBishop of Christchurch, New Zealand
28 Jan 196459.6DiedBishop of Christchurch, New Zealand

MicroData Summary for Edward Michael Joyce:
Bishop Edward Michael Joyce (born , died ) Bishop of Christchurch

  • a priest for 33.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013