Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Rarotonga

Dioecesis Rarotonganus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Paul Donoghue, S.M., Bishop
  • Stuart France O’Connell, S.M., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 21 June 1966
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Suva
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Cook Islands
  • Region: Pacific (Oceania)
  • Square Kilometers: 234 (90 Square Miles)
  • Web Site: http://www.relpac.org.fj/rarotonga.htm
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, P.O. Box 147, Avarua, Rarotonga, Cook Islands
  • Telephone: 20.817
  • Fax: 29.817

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Cook e Mnihiki
27 November 1922ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Cook e Mnihiki (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Cook Islands
11 August 1926Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Cook e Mnihiki Prefecture Apostolic of Cook Islands
Vicariate Apostolic of Cook Islands
12 February 1948ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Cook Islands Vicariate Apostolic of Cook Islands
Diocese of Rarotonga
21 June 1966ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Cook Islands Diocese of Rarotonga

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Rarotonga
19692,26019,24711.7%113141611374ap1971
19802,80126,00010.8%41014200131412ap1981
19902,71019,65013.8%3811246121015ap1991
19993,35617,55019.1%3474799615ap2000
20003,36017,50019.2%25748010615ap2001
20013,14015,10020.8%16744811615ap2002
20022,39614,90016.1%16734210615ap2003
20033,09018,02717.1%1674419415ap2004
20042,51914,99016.8%6641910315ap2005
20103,08912,32025.1%4593438915ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.7, 29 Jan 2012; data: 15 Feb 2012