Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Roberto Lückert León

Archbishop Emeritus of Coro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1939 BornMaracaibo
14 Aug 196626.6Ordained PriestPriest of Maracaibo, Venezuela
27 Apr 198545.3AppointedBishop of Cabimas, Venezuela
29 Jun 198545.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cabimas, Venezuela
21 Jul 199353.6AppointedBishop of Coro, Venezuela
2 Oct 199353.8InstalledBishop of Coro, Venezuela
23 Nov 199858.9AppointedArchbishop of Coro, Venezuela
18 Feb 201474.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Punto Fijo, Venezuela
14 Aug 201676.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Punto Fijo, Venezuela
25 Oct 201676.8RetiredArchbishop of Coro, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Roberto Lückert León
Archbishop Roberto Lückert León (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Coro

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Coro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: CB, 15 Apr 2014
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Oct 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 25 Oct 2016