Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Elie Rischa (Richa)

Deceased

Bishop of Baalbek (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1878BornHaret Sakhr
24 Jun 190324.9Ordained PriestPriest
25 Apr 192647.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nazareth per i Maroniti
25 Apr 192647.7SelectedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth per i Maroniti
21 Jun 192647.9ConfirmedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth per i Maroniti
10 Oct 193759.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Baalbek (Maronite), Lebanon
24 Aug 195375.1DiedBishop of Baalbek (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Elie Rischa (Richa):
Archbishop Elie Rischa (Richa) (born , died ) Bishop of Baalbek

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013